MD HB874 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a court to vacate a certain probation before judgment or judgment of conviction under certain circumstances; establishing the requirements for a certain motion; requiring the State to notify a certain defendant of the filing of a certain motion in a certain manner; authorizing the defendant to file a response to a certain motion within 30 days after receipt of a certain notice or within the period of time that the court orders; requiring that a certain victim or victim's representative be notified of a certain hearing; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - State's Motion to Vacate

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (98-41)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {912616/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback