MD HB873 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that certain provisions of law do not apply to certain individuals; prohibiting individuals from simultaneously being a candidate for a party office and an elected public office; and prohibiting individuals from simultaneously holding a party office and an elected public office.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law – Party and Elected Public Offices – Prohibitions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (101-29)
2020-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13HouseFloor Amendment {503523/1 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
2020-03-13HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {875064/1 Adopted
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2020-02-04HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law5204(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback