MD HB873 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a certain provision of law specifying a certain processing fee for articles of transfer; repealing each provision of law regarding executing and filing articles of transfer; altering the types of actions not required by a corporation for certain transfers of assets, creations of security interests, or exchanges of shares of stocks; clarifying that a transfer of assets by a corporation occurring before October 1, 2018, is not invalid solely because of a failure to file articles of transfer; etc.
Title
Corporations – Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2018-04-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {293890/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-16 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Assessments
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Associations
Clerks of Court
Contracts
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Counties
Deeds
Fees
Investments
Recordation
Securities
Taxes - Property
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Associations
Clerks of Court
Contracts
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Counties
Deeds
Fees
Investments
Recordation
Securities
Taxes - Property