MD HB872 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 353
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 353
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the membership of the State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services to include two additional members from the Department of Juvenile Services.
Title
State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 353 |
2020-03-16 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-39) |
2020-03-03 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-02 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB467 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 354
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 9 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 9 | 212 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |