MD HB871 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 27 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Board of Regents of the University System of Maryland to make a one-time transfer of up to $25,000,000 from the non-State supported fund balance to a quasi-endowment fund; limiting the use of certain proceeds to certain purposes; and stating the intent of the General Assembly for the source of a certain transfer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - University System of Maryland - Quasi-Endowment Funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-26SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-23SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-23SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-23SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-20SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-02SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-02-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-27HouseFavorable with Amendments {764565/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback