MD HB871 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing from 60 days to 45 days the period of time during which a vehicle owned by a new resident of the State and displaying valid registration issued by the jurisdiction of the resident's former domicile is not subject to the requirement that specified vehicles driven on a highway be registered in accordance with specified provisions of law.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Registration of Vehicles - New Residents
Sponsors
Del. Carolyn Howard [D] | Del. Wade Kach [R] | Del. James Proctor [D] | Del. Melvin Stukes [D] |
Del. Frank Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn | |
2010-03-02 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0871.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0871f.pdf |