MD HB870 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Encouraging each county board of education to implement an agricultural education program that prepares students for successful careers and informed choices relating to certain systems and for opportunities in agriculture-related employment and higher education by providing instruction and developing skills in certain areas through certain integrated classroom and laboratory instruction, supervised agricultural experiences, and leadership experiences and involvement in student organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools - Agricultural Education Programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-02SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-02-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-27HouseFavorable with Amendments {985068/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-16HouseHearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback