MD HB87 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB283
Note: Carry Foward to future HB687
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1226
Note: Carry Foward to future HB687
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1226
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a school bus be routed with the intent that the number of pupils on the bus does not exceed the manufacturer's rated seating capacity for the bus; and providing that if an emergency or temporary situation causes the number of pupils on the bus to exceed the seating capacity, the situation shall be corrected within a reasonable period of time.
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
Sponsors
Del. Dana Jones [D] | Del. Heather Bagnall [D] | Del. Sandy Bartlett [D] | Del. Jessica Feldmark [D] |
Del. Shaneka Henson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-2) |
2021-02-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-04 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-07-07 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB87 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB87 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB253 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-09 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
HB1226 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB87 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB253 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-09 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
HB1226 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Emergencies
Motor Vehicle Operation
Safety
School Buses
Students
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Motor Vehicle Operation
Safety
School Buses
Students
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 1118 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |