MD HB868 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Hearing: Mar 12 @ 1:00 pm House Health and Government Operations Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Designating the day after Thanksgiving as American Indian Heritage Day and a public school holiday; requiring public schools to devote part of at least one day to appropriate exercises for American Indian Heritage Day; designating September 17 for Constitution Day and Citizenship Day as a public school holiday; repealing Columbus Day as a legal State holiday; designating September 17 for Constitution Day and Citizenship Day as a legal State holiday; and designating statewide primary election days as legal State holidays.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State and Public School Holidays - Designation and Observance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-07HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
2020-02-07HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2020-02-06HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
2020-02-05HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
2020-02-05HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education7103(n/a)See Bill Text
General Provisions1111(n/a)See Bill Text
State Personnel and Pensions9201(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback