MD HB868 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating the day after Thanksgiving as American Indian Heritage Day and a public school holiday; requiring public schools to devote part of at least one day to appropriate exercises for American Indian Heritage Day; designating September 17 for Constitution Day and Citizenship Day as a public school holiday; repealing Columbus Day as a legal State holiday; designating September 17 for Constitution Day and Citizenship Day as a legal State holiday; and designating statewide primary election days as legal State holidays.
Title
State and Public School Holidays - Designation and Observance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) |
2020-02-07 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) |
2020-02-07 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing canceled (Ways and Means) |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) and Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means) |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means |
Subjects
Elections
Historical Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Historical Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 1 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 9 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0868?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0868f.pdf |