MD HB866 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating the use of genetic data by direct-to-consumer genetic testing companies, including by requiring a direct-to-consumer genetic testing company to provide consumers with clear and complete information regarding the company's policies and procedures, obtain certain consents from consumers before collecting, using, or disclosing the consumer's genetic data, and develop and implement policies and procedures to protect genetic data and provide certain disclosures to law enforcement or other government agencies; etc.
Title
Genetic Information Privacy - Consumer Protection and Forensic Genealogy
Sponsors
Del. Lily Qi [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Hershey) Adopted (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Motion Reconsider Vote (Senator Hershey) Adopted (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Feldman) Rejected (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Floor Amendment 353921/1 (Senator Sydnor) Rejected (Y: 18 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Sydnor) Adopted (Y: 24 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Hershey) Adopted (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Motion Reconsider Vote (Senator Hershey) Adopted (Y: 39 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Feldman) Rejected (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Floor Amendment 353921/1 (Senator Sydnor) Rejected (Y: 18 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Sydnor) Adopted (Y: 24 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (106-26) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-15) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Hershey) Adopted (38-9) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Motion Reconsider Vote (Senator Hershey) Adopted (39-7) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Feldman) Rejected (31-12) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Floor Amendment {353921/1 (Senator Sydnor) Rejected (18-25) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Kelley) Adopted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Floor Amendment {353921/1 (Senator Sydnor) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {483322/1 Adopted |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Sydnor) Adopted (24-20) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {483322/1 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (104-25) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {783629/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB766 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-08 - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Biometrics
Chemical Tests
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Disabilities
Disclosure
Ethics
Federal Government
Genetics
Health
Health Insurance
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Insurance
internet
Laboratories
Law Enforcement
Medical Research
Notices
Privacy
Public Information
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Chemical Tests
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Crimes and Punishments
Data
Disabilities
Disclosure
Ethics
Federal Government
Genetics
Health
Health Insurance
Higher Education
Industry and Technology
Insurance
internet
Laboratories
Law Enforcement
Medical Research
Notices
Privacy
Public Information
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 13 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 17 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 17 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 17 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |