MD HB866 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a State's Attorney to file a petition to freeze assets of a defendant charged with a specified financial crime involving a vulnerable or elder adult under specified circumstances; requiring that a petition to freeze assets be served in accordance with the Maryland Rules and include specified information; authorizing a court to grant a petition to freeze assets and issue an order to freeze assets under specified circumstances; requiring that an order to freeze assets remain in effect for a specified period of time; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2013-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-07 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Evidence
Liens
Notices
Personal Property
Petitions
Process Serving
Real Property
Restitution
State's Attorneys
Theft
Victims
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Disabilities
Elderly Persons
Evidence
Liens
Notices
Personal Property
Petitions
Process Serving
Real Property
Restitution
State's Attorneys
Theft
Victims