MD HB864 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a memorandum of understanding agreed to and ratified under certain provisions of law from expiring until it is succeeded by a memorandum of understanding agreed to and ratified under certain provisions of law; requiring that the terms of a certain memorandum of understanding continue in force and effect until a certain memorandum of understanding is agreed to and ratified; authorizing an exclusive representative to file a certain action in a circuit court under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Collective Bargaining - Memorandum of Understanding - Continuation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (88-47) (Y: 89 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-11 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {433920/2 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (49-84) (Y: 50 N: 85 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
2018-03-27HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-26SenateThird Reading Passed (33-14)
2018-03-23SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-23SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-22SenateSpecial Order until 3/23 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2018-03-22SenateFavorable
2018-03-22SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2018-03-22SenateFavorable
2018-03-21SenateSpecial Order until 3/22 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2018-03-21SenateFavorable
2018-03-21SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-16SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (88-47)
2018-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-14HouseFloor Amendment {433920/2 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (49-84)
2018-03-13HouseSpecial Order until 3/14 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted
2018-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {444863/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2018-02-23HouseHearing 2/23 at 2:00 p.m.
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0864&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0864f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0864t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_23_hb0864t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0864_44486301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0864_43392002.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0864.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0864_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0383.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0456.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0864_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0824.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback