MD HB862 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 510
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 510
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing in St. Mary's County the aggregate amount of bonds and other evidences of indebtedness outstanding from 2.15% to 3.15% of certain assessable real property in the County; requiring an amount equal to at least 40% of a certain percent limitation to be available to the St. Mary's Metropolitan Commission for certain bonds or other evidences of indebtedness; altering the total amount of debt the St. Mary's County Metropolitan Commission may incur from 25% to 2% of the total value of certain property within certain districts; etc.
Title
St. Mary’s County and Metropolitan Commission – Debt Limitations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 510 |
2021-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {894467/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2021-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties - Local Laws
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Local Government Mandates
Real Property
Sanitary Districts
Sewage
St. Mary's County
Water
Counties - Local Laws
County and Baltimore City Bonds
Local Government Mandates
Real Property
Sanitary Districts
Sewage
St. Mary's County
Water
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
St. Mary's County | 113 | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
St. Mary's County | 27 | 11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |