MD HB862 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying certain provisions of law related to the employment of certain individuals who are receiving a service retirement allowance or a vested allowance from the State Police Retirement System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Police Retirement System - Employment of Retirees - Clarifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 209
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {399834/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m.
2019-03-19SenateHearing canceled
2019-03-18SenateHearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m.
2019-03-15SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {184662/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0862&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0862f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0862t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0862e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_209_hb0862e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0862_18466201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/hb0862_39983401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/hb0862.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0862_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0469.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0862_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0986.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1206.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback