MD HB862 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying certain provisions of law related to the employment of certain individuals who are receiving a service retirement allowance or a vested allowance from the State Police Retirement System.
Title
State Police Retirement System - Employment of Retirees - Clarifications
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209 |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {399834/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {184662/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Law Enforcement
Notices
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
State Pensions and Retirement
State Police, Department of
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Communications
Law Enforcement
Notices
Retirement Systems
Salaries and Compensation
State Pensions and Retirement
State Police, Department of
Time
Work, Labor and Employment