MD HB858 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring regulations adopted by the Board of Public Works to prohibit a unit from assessing liquidated damages for certain contracts for which a certain minority business enterprise was named on a participation schedule or named on a participation schedule and qualified based on a certain code; and providing that existing obligations or contract rights may not be impaired by the Act.
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Required Regulations - Liquidated Damages Prohibition
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] | Del. Terri Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House Floor - Sustained (0-140) (Y: 1 N: 141 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House Floor - Sustained (0-140) (Y: 1 N: 141 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481 |
2018-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-27 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Assessments
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Damages
Minorities
Public Works
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Damages
Minorities
Public Works
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement