MD HB856 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Washington County to issue a university and college hospitality beer, wine, and liquor license to a university or college that offers a hospitality and tourism management degree program under certain circumstances; authorizing a license holder to allow the preparation, serving, and consumption of beer, wine, and liquor by certain individuals; and authorizing a license fee of $750 and an annual fee for a Sunday permit of $250.
Title
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - University and College Hospitality Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 760 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Fees
Higher Education
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
State Universities and Colleges
Storage
Washington County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Boundaries
Fees
Higher Education
License Commissioners, Boards of
Retail Sales
State Universities and Colleges
Storage
Washington County
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 1007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 31 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |