MD HB856 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the Maryland earned income tax credit to allow certain individuals without certain qualifying children to claim the credit; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; and making the Act contingent on the taking effect of another Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Earned Income Tax Credit – Individuals Without Qualifying Children – Repeal of Minimum Age Requirement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-3) (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 612
2018-04-05HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (131-3)
2018-04-05HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2018-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {229036/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-28SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {305563/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-28HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0856&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0856f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0856t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0856e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_612_hb0856e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0856_30556301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0856_22903601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb0856.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0856_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0673.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0856_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0927.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1135.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback