MD HB855 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain units to make a certain certification regarding certain local regulations; requiring the Department of Budget and management to provide training to certain units on the preparation of certain economic analyses; requiring certain units to establish a certain electronic registry and to post on the registry a proposed regulation that has a significant small business impact; requiring certain units to create certain compliance guides to assist small businesses to comply with certain regulations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government - Regulations Impacting Small Businesses - Economic Impact Analyses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {196180/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback