MD HB854 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Highway Administration to notify the political subdivision or agency that owns a water or sewer line that must be relocated due to a federal project of the cost of the relocation; requiring the Administration to investigate funding sources to help the political subdivision or agency that owns the utility to meet its share of the cost of relocating the water or sewer line and, if needed, to develop a payment plan; etc.
Title
State Highway Administration - Relocation of Water or Sewer Lines - Cost Sharing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {910711/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Armed Forces
Counties
Federal Government
Highway Administration, State
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Prices
Sewage
Transportation - Highways
Utilities
Water
Armed Forces
Counties
Federal Government
Highway Administration, State
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Prices
Sewage
Transportation - Highways
Utilities
Water