MD HB854 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each policy of homeowner's, farmowner's, or dwelling insurance issued, sold, or delivered in the State that provides property coverage for a dwelling or personal property on a replacement cost basis to contain a provision that allows an insured to file a claim for the difference between the actual cash value and the replacement cost for the completed repairs or replacement for not less than 2 years after the date of loss.
Title
Homeowner's, Farmowner's, and Dwelling Insurance Policies - Claims for
Sponsors
Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Jon Cardin [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] | Del. Joseph Minnick [D] |
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-03-26 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-25 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2010-03-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-12 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading Economic Matters |