MD HB853 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the purpose of a certain clean energy loan program established by a county or municipality to include loans to certain residential and commercial property owners to finance certain grid resilience projects; and requiring a certain ordinance or resolution that establishes a certain clean energy loan program to include certain eligibility requirements for certain grid resilience projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government - Clean Energy Loan Programs - Grid Resilience Projects

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateReferred Rules
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {273691/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-05HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Local Government11101(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government11102(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government11103(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government11104(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback