MD HB852 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a specified limitations period on an action for injunctive relief or damages for a violation of a collective bargaining agreement covering an employee of the State or a political subdivision of the State or a breach by an exclusive representative of the duty of fair representation owed to an employee of the State or a political subdivision of the State; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Courts - Action for Violation of Collective Bargaining Agreement or Breach of Duty of Fair Representation - Limitations Period
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483 |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {514568/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2017-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Collective Bargaining
Counties - Generally
Damages
Public Employees
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Statutes of Limitation
Civil Actions and Procedures
Collective Bargaining
Counties - Generally
Damages
Public Employees
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Statutes of Limitation