MD HB851 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Rereferred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Rereferred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the purpose of the Partnership for Workforce Quality Program and the eligible uses of grants under the Program to include training for new employees; providing that at least 60% of the money available is reserved for employers with 150 or fewer employees in the State, and up to 20% of the available money is for employers with more than 150 but less than 500 employees; establishing that a maximum of $200,000 of the money available may be provided to an employer with 500 employees based in the State under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Partnership for Workforce Quality Program - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {973195/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB26 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-29 - Referred Economic Matters
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 3 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 3 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 3 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 3 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 3 | 412 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |