MD HB850 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, in fiscal years 2022 and 2023, the Board of Directors of the Maryland Corps Program to give priority to, when awarding Program funds, certain Program participants who serve with certain nonprofit corporations or government agencies that provide certain COVID-19 related services; and providing that if certain funding becomes available from the federal government it is the intent of the General Assembly that the funding be deposited in the Maryland Corps Program Fund.
Title
Higher Education – Maryland Corps Program Fund – COVID–19 Emergency Funding Priorities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-1) |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-02-21 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
COVID-19
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Education
Emergencies
Food
Health
Higher Education
Juvenile Facilities
Literacy
Minorities
Natural Resources
Nonprofit Organizations
Poverty
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Veterans
Work, Labor, and Employment
Youth
Conservation
COVID-19
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Education
Emergencies
Food
Health
Higher Education
Juvenile Facilities
Literacy
Minorities
Natural Resources
Nonprofit Organizations
Poverty
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Veterans
Work, Labor, and Employment
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 24 | 1108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 24 | 1109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |