MD HB850 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a certain county plan to designate, on or before July 1, 2019, an appropriate agency of the county to be responsible for creating a workable plan to address the disposal of mattresses and box springs and the expansion and development of certain businesses for certain purposes; requiring the Office of Recycling within the Department of the Environment to encourage certain programs that divert mattresses and box springs from disposal in landfills and incinerators; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solid Waste Management and Recycling – Mattresses and Box Springs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-17HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-21HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback