MD HB85 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB890

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the prohibition on a public school employer negotiating the maximum number of students assigned to a class.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Collective Bargaining - Certificated Employees - Class Size

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-27HouseHearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
2023-01-27HouseHearing canceled
2023-01-18HouseHearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2023-01-11HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2022-09-09HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB890 (Carry Over) 2022-02-08 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
SB206 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-20 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education6408(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback