MD HB849 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain hospitals to provide each patient with written notice that includes certain information related to outpatient facility fees that are charged for services provided at the hospital; requiring the Health Education and Advocacy Unit within the Attorney General's Office, in consultation with the Health Care Services Cost Review Commission, consumers, and other stakeholders, to develop a uniform disclosure form and a process for determining and updating the range of fees and fee estimates as required by the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {946286/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-19HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback