MD HB848 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Indirect Potable Reuse Pilot Program in the Department of the Environment for the purpose of authorizing the regulated use of reclaimed water as a source for drinking water treatment facilities; providing for the issuance of potable reuse permits under the Pilot Program; applying certain public participation requirements to potable reuse permits; requiring the Department to submit a report on the status of the Pilot Program to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 31, 2024; etc.
Title
Drinking Water - Indirect Potable Reuse Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsors
Del. April Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122 |
2023-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-0) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2023-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {543025/1 Adopted |
2023-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-27 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2023-02-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m. |
2023-02-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB407 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Emergency Bills
Engineers
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Fraud
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Licenses
Pilot Programs
Public Buildings and Facilities
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Sunset
Time
Utilities
Water
Weights and Measures
Emergency Bills
Engineers
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Fraud
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Licenses
Pilot Programs
Public Buildings and Facilities
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Standards and Best Practices
studies
Sunset
Time
Utilities
Water
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 1 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 303.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 303.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |