MD HB848 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB452
Note: Carry Over of previous HB597
Note: Carry Over of previous HB597
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an individual from being arrested or incarcerated for failure to respond to certain orders to appear in court relating to an examination in aid of enforcement of a money judgment entered in a small claim action in the District Court; etc.
Title
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to Appear
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 93 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (93-41) |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB848 (Carry Over) 2021-03-18 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB657 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-26 - Hearing 3/03 at 12:30 p.m.
HB597 (Carry Over) 2013-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
SB657 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-26 - Hearing 3/03 at 12:30 p.m.
HB597 (Carry Over) 2013-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary Withdrawn
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 11 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |