MD HB848 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 342
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 342
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which the Montgomery County Council may impose a tax on the transfer of agricultural land; providing that the tax does not apply to a transfer of agricultural land if the land was subject to the tax at the time of a previous transfer; requiring that the revenue derived from the tax on transfers of agricultural land be used for agricultural land preservation; and requiring that the tax on the transfer of agricultural land be reduced by 65% under certain circumstances.
Title
Montgomery County - Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Alterations MC 7-20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 342 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Agriculture
Assessments
Farmland
Land Preservation Trusts
Montgomery County
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax
Assessments
Farmland
Land Preservation Trusts
Montgomery County
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer
Transfer Tax
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Montgomery County | 52 | 30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |