MD HB848 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a defendant in a malpractice claim against a licensed professional to move for a protective order to limit the disclosure of certain documentary evidence under certain circumstances; requiring a court, upon a certain motion by the defendant, to review the claimant's request for documentary evidence and authorizing the court to issue a certain protective order for good cause shown; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Title
Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
Sponsors
Del. Susan McComas [R] | Del. Michael Malone [R] | Del. Ric Metzgar [R] | Del. Neil Parrott [R] |
Del. Lauren Arikan [R] | Del. Jon Cardin [D] | Del. Robin Grammer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {792917/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 11:30 a.m. |
2019-02-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Architects
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Courts
Engineers
Evidence
Interior Designers
Landscape Architects
Protection Orders
Records
Surveyors
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Courts
Engineers
Evidence
Interior Designers
Landscape Architects
Protection Orders
Records
Surveyors