MD HB847 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-17)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 341
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the State Coordinator for Autism Strategy in the Department of Disabilities and the Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs; requiring the State Coordinator, in consultation with the Advisory Stakeholder Group, to identify and evaluate certain services for individuals with autism and their families, develop a certain strategic plan by July 1, 2021, identify certain performance measures, and monitor and evaluate the implementation of the strategic plan and the State's success in addressing certain needs; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Coordinator for Autism Strategy and Advisory Stakeholder Group on Autism-Related Needs

Sponsors

Del. Michele Guyton [D]Del. Michael Griffith [R]Del. Gabriel Acevero [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]
Del. Carl Anderton [R]Del. Lauren Arikan [R]Del. Dalya Attar [D]Del. Heather Bagnall [D]
Del. Joseph Boteler [R]Del. Regina Boyce [D]Del. Tony Bridges [D]Del. Jason Buckel [R]
Del. Alice Cain [D]Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D]Del. Frank Conaway [D]Del. Dan Cox [R]
Del. Jessica Feldmark [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]Del. Wanika Fisher [D]Del. Catherine Forbes [D]
Del. James Gilchrist [D]Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Julian Ivey [D]Del. Carl Jackson [D]
Del. Ken Kerr [D]Del. Marc Korman [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Mary Lehman [D]
Del. Jazz Lewis [D]Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Sara Love [D]
Del. Eric Luedtke [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Ric Metzgar [R]Del. Nick Mosby [D]
Del. Julie Palakovich Carr [D]Del. Jesse Pippy [R]Del. April Rose [R]Del. Stephanie Smith [D]
Del. Jared Solomon [D]Del. Jen Terrasa [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Courtney Watson [D]
Del. Jheanelle Wilkins [D]Del. Nicole Williams [D]Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Pat Young [D]
Del. Nino Mangione [R]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Lisa Belcastro [D]
Del. Harry Bhandari [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]Del. Nick Charles [D]Del. Brian Chisholm [R]
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]Del. Steve Johnson [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]
Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R]Del. Susan Krebs [R]Del. Matt Morgan [R]Del. Teresa Reilly [R]
Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sid Saab [R]Del. Kathy Szeliga [R]

Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 341
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-13SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {666582/1 Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Human Services7101(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services7111(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services7112(n/a)See Bill Text
Human Services7120(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback