MD HB844 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the State to purchase a certain insurance policy to satisfy a bond requirement to protect certain losses of State Retirement and Pension System assets.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Retirement and Pension System - Fiduciary Insurance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-01SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-31SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-31SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2021-02-26SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2021-02-25HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2021-02-23HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-02-22HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2021-02-01HouseHearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB641 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-08 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Personnel and Pensions21210(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback