MD HB844 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 338
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 338
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a club public event permit in the City of Annapolis; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the permit to a holder of a Class C license; specifying that the permit authorizes a club to sell certain alcoholic beverages to a certain individual for on-premises consumption during a certain public event; requiring a permit holder to apply to the Board at least 45 days before an event; authorizing the Board to approve up to 12 public events per permit holder in a calendar year; etc.
Title
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Club Public Event Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 338 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2020-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments {283691/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB503 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 339
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Annapolis
Boundaries
Forms
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Retail Sales
Special Events
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Annapolis
Boundaries
Forms
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Retail Sales
Special Events
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 10 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 10 | 1104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |