MD HB844 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Veto sustained (0-140)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the assessment of points and the penalties associated with the suspension of a driver's license or privilege to drive for failure to attend a specified driver improvement program or is an obligor 60 days or more out of compliance with the most recent order of the court in making child support payments.
Title
Driver Improvement Program and Failure to Pay Child Support - Driver's License Suspensions - Penalties and Assessment of Points
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | House | Veto sustained (0-140) |
2017-05-26 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-2) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {842115/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Drivers' Licenses
Fines
Highways
Interstate Affairs
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Sunset
Support of Dependents
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Drivers' Licenses
Fines
Highways
Interstate Affairs
Motor Vehicle Operation
Penalties and Sentences
Sunset
Support of Dependents
Traffic Regulation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration