MD HB843 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Baltimore Regional Water Governance Task Force to study approaches to water and wastewater governance in the Baltimore region; and requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Mayor of Baltimore City, the County Executive of Baltimore County, the Governor, and the General Assembly on or before January 30, 2024.
Title
Baltimore Regional Water Governance Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Floor Amendment 763628/1 (Delegate R. Long) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 95 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Floor Amendment 763628/1 (Delegate R. Long) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 95 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 179 |
2023-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-3) |
2023-04-07 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Floor Amendment {923422/1 (Senator M. Washington) Adopted |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Floor Amendment {593925/1 (Senator M. Washington) Withdrawn |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator King) Adopted |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment {593925/1 (Senator M. Washington) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {263728/1 Adopted |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-4) |
2023-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment {763628/1 (Delegate R. Long) Rejected (39-95) |
2023-03-14 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate R. Long) Adopted |
2023-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-27 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2023-02-27 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-15 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 2:00 p.m. |
2023-02-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-09 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB880 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Subjects
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Building Maintenance and Repair
Committees and Commissions
County Executives
Debt Management
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Service, Maryland
Health
Local Government - Generally
Public Officials
Reports
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Safety
Sewage
studies
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Water
Work, Labor, and Employment
Baltimore County
Building Maintenance and Repair
Committees and Commissions
County Executives
Debt Management
Emergencies
Emergency Bills
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Service, Maryland
Health
Local Government - Generally
Public Officials
Reports
Rivers, Streams, and Lakes
Safety
Sewage
studies
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Water
Work, Labor, and Employment