MD HB841 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1123
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-17 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an exemption from the Maryland Wage and Hour Law for an individual employed at an agricultural stand, a retail farm, or a farmers' market that primarily sells agricultural products that the employer has produced.
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Agricultural Stands, Retail Farms, and Farmers' Markets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB502 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-26 - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1123 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1123 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Agriculture
Commerce and Business
Farmland
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Salaries and Compensation
Transient Merchants
Work, Labor, and Employment
Commerce and Business
Farmland
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Salaries and Compensation
Transient Merchants
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 3 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |