MD HB839 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting, in certain circumstances, the business entities required to be included on certain lists certified by the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to those entities that did not file a certain report during the prior year.
Title
State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Lists of Business Entities Not Filing Annual Report
Sponsors
Del. Lily Qi [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2021-03-04 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Business Trusts
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Reports
Time
Business Trusts
Corporations
Corporations and Associations
Limited Liability Companies
Partnerships
Reports
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Corporations and Associations | 10 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 12 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 3 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 4A | 911 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 9A | 1007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |