MD HB838 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Renaming the food stamp program to be the food supplement program; establishing a Restaurant Meals Program (RMP) within the food supplement program in the Department of Human Services to expand food access to certain individuals; authorizing a certain household eligible to participate in the RMP if the household is eligible for certain State and federal benefits and lacks a fixed, regular, and adequate nighttime residence and includes certain persons; requiring a restaurant to meet certain requirements to participate; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food Supplement Program - Restaurant Meals Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-37) (Y: 100 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 475
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (99-37)
2019-03-07HouseSpecial Order until 03/08 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2019-03-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {604461/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback