MD HB838 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from requiring specified conditions of coverage for specified infertility benefits for a patient who is married to an individual of the same sex; providing that specified provisions of law relating to health insurance coverage of in vitro fertilization do not apply to insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide specified benefits; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Simonaire) {823429/1 Rejected (17-23) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-44) (Y: 94 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Afzali) {613428/1 Rejected (51-86) (Y: 51 N: 86 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Simonaire) {823429/1 Rejected (17-23) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (94-44) (Y: 94 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Afzali) {613428/1 Rejected (51-86) (Y: 51 N: 86 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {823429/1 Rejected (17-23) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {823429/1 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (94-44) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Flanagan) Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Afzali) {613428/1 Rejected (51-86) |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {356085/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Health Care Facilities
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Marriage
Patients
Pregnancy
Sexual Orientation
Women
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Marriage
Patients
Pregnancy
Sexual Orientation
Women