MD HB836 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a limitation on claiming the income tax credit for eligible long-term care insurance premiums for more than 1 year with respect to the same insured individual; altering the amount of the credit from a one-time $500 credit to a maximum of $250 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2019, but before January 1, 2022, and a maximum of $500 for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2021; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback