MD HB835 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing certain requirements for approval of construction of a new retail service station on or after October 1, 2022, including a setback requirement and the construction of a certain number of electric charging stations; and requiring approving bodies to adopt regulations to carry out the Act on or before January 1, 2023.
Title
Retail Service Stations – New Construction – Setbacks and Electric Charging Stations
Sponsors
Del. Sheila Ruth [D] | Del. Lisa Belcastro [D] | Del. Linda Foley [D] | Del. Mary Lehman [D] |
Del. Jen Terrasa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters) |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Boundaries
Business Regulation
Certifications
Child Care
Construction
Energy Matters
Forests and Parks
Fuel
Hospitals
Local Government - Generally
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Places of Worship
Private Schools
Public Schools
Residential Property
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Service Stations
Time
Weights and Measures
Boundaries
Business Regulation
Certifications
Child Care
Construction
Energy Matters
Forests and Parks
Fuel
Hospitals
Local Government - Generally
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Places of Worship
Private Schools
Public Schools
Residential Property
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Service Stations
Time
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Regulation | 10 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 1 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 10 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Land Use | 7 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |