MD HB832 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that, in Cecil County, both parties to be married appear together before the clerk to apply for a marriage license.
Title
Cecil County - Marriage Licenses - Applications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125 |
2016-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2016-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |