MD HB829 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 746
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a municipality from requiring an individual to provide a reason that the individual will be unable to vote in person on election day in order to vote by absentee ballot.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government - Municipal Elections - No-Excuse Absentee Voting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-11) (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 746
2018-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (35-11)
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-28SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-27HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-02-23HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-02-23HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-02-22HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-16HouseHearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback