MD HB826 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a specified penalty for late payment of the Maryland estate tax if an alternative payment schedule is allowed by the Comptroller and the tax is paid in accordance with the alternative payment schedule; and providing that the Act will apply to an estate that applies for an alternative payment schedule for payment of the Maryland estate tax on or after July 1, 2015, and receives approval by the Comptroller to pay the estate tax in accordance with an alternative payment schedule.
Title
Estate Tax - Alternative Payment Schedule - Penalty Prohibition
Sponsors
Del. Sheila Hixson [D] | Del. Darryl Barnes [D] | Del. Eric Ebersole [D] | Del. Diana Fennell [D] |
Del. Carolyn Howard [D] | Del. Andrew Platt [D] | Del. Frank Turner [D] | Sen. Mary Washington [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2015-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2015-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |