MD HB826 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to create a stakeholder workgroup to study the implementation of personalized medicine in the State; establishing the membership of the workgroup; requiring the workgroup to review federal reports and recommendations, analyze the impact of the federal Genetic Information Nondiscrimination Act on the State's implementation of personalized medicine, identify obstacles, and make recommendations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Health Care Commission - Personalized Medicine - Study

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-14HouseHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-02-20HouseHearing cancelled
2013-02-28HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-02-06HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback