MD HB824 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Judiciary to collect certain data pertaining to a warrant of restitution or a writ of possession issued in accordance with a certain judgment for possession of residential property; requiring the Judiciary to share complete eviction data from the immediately preceding month with the Department of Housing and Community Development each month; requiring the Department to make eviction data available in a certain format to a State or local agency or an academic institution located in the State; etc.
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Data - Collection and Distribution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-38) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {113728/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-38) |
2022-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {303825/1 Adopted |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB629 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-08 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Data
Eviction
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Judgments
Landlord and Tenant
Real Property
Reports
Residential Property
Restitution
Warranties
Eviction
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Judgments
Landlord and Tenant
Real Property
Reports
Residential Property
Restitution
Warranties
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 14 | 133 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |