MD HB824 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Hearing: Feb 26 @ 1:00 pm House Environment and Transportation Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of the Environment to establish a beverage container deposit program on or before September 1, 2021; establishing the Advisory Commission to Develop a Beverage Container Deposit Program; requiring the Advisory Commission to develop a framework for a beverage container deposit program; requiring the Advisory Committee to report its framework and recommendations to certain members and committees of the General Assembly by December 31, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Beverage Container Deposit Program - Establishment and Advisory Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
2020-02-03HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Environment91710.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback